MI SB0524 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 198'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 198'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; training; requirement by the Michigan commission on law enforcement standards for fingerprinting and background checks as prerequisite to certain law enforcement training academy; provide for. Amends secs. 9, 9b, 9c, 9d & 11 of 1965 PA 203 (MCL 28.609 et seq.).
Title
Law enforcement; training; requirement by the Michigan commission on law enforcement standards for fingerprinting and background checks as prerequisite to certain law enforcement training academy; provide for. Amends secs. 9, 9b, 9c, 9d & 11 of 1965 PA 203 (MCL 28.609 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 422 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 345 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 345 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 198'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/15/2017 @ 1:46 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/15/2017 @ 10:34 Am |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/12/2017 @ 12:20 Pm |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-12-05 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-12-05 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-12-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 422 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2017-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-09-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-09-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-26 | House | Received On 09/26/2017 |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 345 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Subjects
Law enforcement: background check
Law enforcement: fingerprinting
Law enforcement: training
State agencies (existing): state police
Law enforcement: fingerprinting
Law enforcement: training
State agencies (existing): state police