MI SB0502 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; registration plates; eligibility for disabled veteran registration plate; extend to partially disabled veterans. Amends sec. 803f of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.803f).
Title
Vehicles; registration plates; eligibility for disabled veteran registration plate; extend to partially disabled veterans. Amends sec. 803f of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.803f).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 384 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-05-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-30 | House | Received On 05/30/2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 384 Yeas 32 Nays 0 Excused 5 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Marty Knollenberg |