MI SB0493 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Assigned Pa 0217'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Assigned Pa 0217'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: other; commercial rehabilitation certificates; extend sunset. Amends sec. 16 of 2005 PA 210 (MCL 207.856).
Title
Economic development: other; commercial rehabilitation certificates; extend sunset. Amends sec. 16 of 2005 PA 210 (MCL 207.856).
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 439 (Y: 93 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 331 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-11-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 331 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-11-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0217'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2020 12:46 Pm |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/15/2020 10:16 Am |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/05/2020 11:32 Am |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-09-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-09-24 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 439 Yeas 93 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-12-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
2019-12-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-12-05 | House | Received On 12/05/2019 |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 331 Yeas 33 Nays 1 Excused 4 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |