MI SB0478 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-17 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-17 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; auctioneers; definition of snowmobile dealers in NREPA; strike reference to registered auctioneers. Amends sec. 82101 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.82101). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0476'13
Title
Occupations; auctioneers; definition of snowmobile dealers in NREPA; strike reference to registered auctioneers. Amends sec. 82101 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.82101). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0476'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 422 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-10-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-17 | House | Received On 10/17/2013 |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 422 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Hildenbrand |