MI SB0463 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education: graduation requirements; completion of the Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA) by pupils; require as condition of graduation. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1278e.
Title
Education: graduation requirements; completion of the Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA) by pupils; require as condition of graduation. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1278e.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 640 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 640 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 640 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 640 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-12-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2023-11-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-11-02 | House | Received On 11/02/2023 |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 640 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2023-08-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 640 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-08-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darrin Camilleri |
2024-12-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
Subjects
Education: graduation requirements
Education: public school academies
Education: school districts
Education: students
Education: public school academies
Education: school districts
Education: students