MI SB0441 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0259'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0259'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance; statements and reports; electronic filing and internet disclosure system; allow counties to adopt. Amends 1976 PA 388 (MCL 169.201 - 169.282) by adding sec. 18a.
Title
Campaign finance; statements and reports; electronic filing and internet disclosure system; allow counties to adopt. Amends 1976 PA 388 (MCL 169.201 - 169.282) by adding sec. 18a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 490 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 528 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 528 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0259'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2013 @ 1:28 Pm |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/20/2013 @ 10:32 Am |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/18/2013 @ 2:20 Pm 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-12-12 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2013-12-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-12-11 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2013-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 490 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2013-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-12-11 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-12-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-12-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-11-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2013-11-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-11-14 | House | Received On 11/14/2013 |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 528 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Robertson |
Subjects
Campaign finance, committees
Campaign finance, contributions and expenditures
Campaign finance, statements and reports
State agencies (existing), state
Campaign finance, contributions and expenditures
Campaign finance, statements and reports
State agencies (existing), state