MI SB0439 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-29 - Assigned Pa 0229'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-29 - Assigned Pa 0229'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; guardians; definition of child; modify age criteria to continue to receive guardianship assistance. Amends sec. 6 of 2008 PA 260 (MCL 722.876). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0435'11
Title
Children; guardians; definition of child; modify age criteria to continue to receive guardianship assistance. Amends sec. 6 of 2008 PA 260 (MCL 722.876). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0435'11
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Nofs [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] | Sen. Mark Jansen [R] | Sen. Bruce Caswell [R] |
Sen. Judith Emmons [R] | Sen. John Moolenaar [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 694 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 469 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 423 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 469 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 423 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-29 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0229'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/22/2011 @ 11:40 Am |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/22/2011 @ 8:46 Am |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/17/2011 @ 2:27 Pm |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Roll Call # 694 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2011-11-10 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2011-11-10 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2011-11-09 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-11-09 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2011-11-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 469 Yeas 105 Nays 3 |
2011-11-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-11-08 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2011-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-11-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-11-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-06-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 423 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-06-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-06-30 | House | Received On 06/30/2011 |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |