MI SB0434 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 0020'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 0020'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations: cosmetologists; licensure of mobile cosmetology units; provide for, and make general revisions. Amends secs. 1201, 1203, 1203b, 1204, 1205, 1211, 1217 & 1218 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1201 et seq.); adds sec. 1205a & repeals sec. 1214 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1214).
Title
Occupations: cosmetologists; licensure of mobile cosmetology units; provide for, and make general revisions. Amends secs. 1201, 1203, 1203b, 1204, 1205, 1211, 1217 & 1218 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1201 et seq.); adds sec. 1205a & repeals sec. 1214 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1214).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 276 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 276 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0020'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/27/2020 03:32 Pm |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 01/27/2020 02:01 Pm |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Presented To Governor 01/17/2020 03:08 Pm |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 7 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-01-08 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-01-08 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-01-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 Yeas 102 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-01-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-12-11 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-11-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-10-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-23 | House | Received On 10/23/2019 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 276 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Aric Nesbitt |
Subjects
Occupations: business licensing and registration
Occupations: cosmetologists
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations: cosmetologists
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs