MI SB0434 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0193'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0193'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Financial institutions; credit unions; access to cash benefits from certain automated teller machines (ATMs) with bridge card; prohibit. Amends 2003 PA 215 (MCL 490.101 - 490.601) by adding sec. 413.
Title
Financial institutions; credit unions; access to cash benefits from certain automated teller machines (ATMs) with bridge card; prohibit. Amends 2003 PA 215 (MCL 490.101 - 490.601) by adding sec. 413.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. Tonya Schuitmaker [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] | Sen. David Robertson [R] |
Sen. Glenn Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 452 (Y: 101 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 432 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 432 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0193'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/18/2013 @ 3:15 Pm |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/17/2013 @ 9:32 Pm |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/13/2013 @ 11:46 Am 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-12-10 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2013-12-05 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-12-05 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2013-12-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 452 Yeas 101 Nays 9 |
2013-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-11-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-11-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-10-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2013-10-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-22 | House | Received On 10/22/2013 |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 432 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Same As/Similar To
HB4860 (Same As) 2013-12-10 - Re-referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
Subjects
Financial institutions, credit unions
Human services, services or financial assistance
State agencies (existing), human services
Human services, services or financial assistance
State agencies (existing), human services