MI SB0409 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0597'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Income tax; deductions; certain pension income; modify. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; deductions; certain pension income; modify. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 913 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 930 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 928 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 864 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 839 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 494 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 292 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0597'12 With Immediate Effect
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 3:20 Pm
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 8:02 Pm
2012-12-31SenatePresented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 3:28 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-13SenateOrdered Enrolled Out Of Session
2012-12-14HouseRe-returned To Senate
2012-12-14House Roll Call # 913 Yeas 104 Nays 1
2012-12-14HouseSenate Amendment(s) To House Substitute H-7 Concurred In
2012-12-13HousePostponed Temporarily
2012-12-12HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2012-12-12HouseRe-returned From Senate With Amendment(s) To House Substitute H-7 With Immediate Effect
2012-12-12Senate Roll Call # 930 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 1
2012-12-12SenateHouse Substitute H-7 Concurred In As Amended
2012-12-12SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2012-12-12SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2012-12-12SenateVote Reconsidered
2012-12-12HouseRequest Granted
2012-12-12HouseSenate Requests Return
2012-12-11SenateSenate Requests Return
2012-12-06HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2012-12-06HouseRe-returned From Senate With Amendment(s) To House Substitute H-7 With Immediate Effect
2012-12-06Senate Roll Call # 864 Yeas 28 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 10
2012-12-06SenateHouse Substitute H-7 Concurred In As Amended
2012-12-06SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2012-12-06SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2012-12-06SenateVote Reconsidered
2012-12-06SenateEnrollment Vacated
2012-12-06SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-06SenateFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-06SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2012-12-06Senate Roll Call # 839 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2012-12-06SenateHouse Substitute H-7 Concurred In
2012-09-13SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2012-09-13SenateHouse Inserted Full Title
2012-06-14HouseReturned To Senate
2012-06-14HouseInserted Full Title
2012-06-14HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 494 Yeas 108 Nays 1
2012-06-14HouseSubstitute H-7 Adopted And Amended
2011-06-30HousePostponed Temporarily
2011-06-30HouseRead A Third Time
2011-06-30HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2011-06-30HousePlaced On Third Reading
2011-06-30HouseRead A Second Time
2011-06-14HousePlaced On Second Reading
2011-06-14HouseRule Suspended
2011-06-14HouseRead A First Time
2011-06-14HouseReceived On 06/14/2011
2011-06-14SenatePassed Roll Call # 292 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2011-06-14SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2011-06-14SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2011-06-14SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2011-06-14SenateRules Suspended
2011-06-14SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2011-06-14SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2011-06-07SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2011-06-07SenateRules Suspended

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-SB-0409
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2011-SIB-0409.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBS-0409.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBH-0409.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2011-SNB-0409.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0597.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2011-SJ-06-14-053.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-06-14-062.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-06-077.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-12-079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-14-083.htm

Bill Comments

feedback