MI SB0408 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; credit; credit for payment of certain student loans; create. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 275.
Title
Individual income tax; credit; credit for payment of certain student loans; create. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 275.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Glenn Anderson |
Same As/Similar To
HB4182 (Same As) 2013-04-24 - Recommendation Concurred In