MI SB0388 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on October 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-17 - Assigned Pa 0323'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on October 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-17 - Assigned Pa 0323'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of fleeing and eluding a peace officer; revise crime class to increase minimum sentence ranges. Amends sec. 16x, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16x).
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of fleeing and eluding a peace officer; revise crime class to increase minimum sentence ranges. Amends sec. 16x, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16x).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-09-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 559 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 627 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 627 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0323'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/9/2012 @ 5:08 Pm |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/9/2012 @ 4:50 Pm |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/2/2012 @ 11:41 Am |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-09-27 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-09-27 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-09-27 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-09-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 559 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-09-27 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-09-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-09-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-09-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-09-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-09-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-13 | House | Received On 09/13/2012 |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Senator Removed As Sponsor: Mike Nofs |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 627 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |