MI SB0384 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Assigned Pa 0043'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Assigned Pa 0043'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Probate; trusts; conflicts between chapter 63 of the revised statutes of 1846 and the Michigan trust code; resolve. Amends 1846 RS 63 (MCL 555.1 - 555.27) by adding sec. 28. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0387'09
Title
Probate; trusts; conflicts between chapter 63 of the revised statutes of 1846 and the Michigan trust code; resolve. Amends 1846 RS 63 (MCL 555.1 - 555.27) by adding sec. 28. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0387'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | Assigned Pa 0043'09 With Immediate Effect | |
2009-06-23 | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/18/2009 @ 9:34 Am | |
2009-06-23 | Approved By Governor 6/18/2009 @ 8:21 Am | |
2009-06-11 | Presented To Governor 6/10/2009 @ 3:56 Pm | |
2009-06-04 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-06-04 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2009-06-04 | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 215 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-06-03 | Returned To Senate | |
2009-06-03 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 269 Yeas 108 Nays 0 | |
2009-06-03 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-06-03 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-03 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-06-03 | Amended | |
2009-06-03 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-04-29 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) | |
2009-04-02 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-04-02 | Read A First Time | |
2009-04-02 | Received On 04/02/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Passed Roll Call # 117 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-04-02 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-04-02 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-04-01 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-04-01 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-04-01 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-03-17 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |