MI SB0384 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-08 - Assigned Pa 0192'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-08 - Assigned Pa 0192'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: insurers; denying or limiting insurance to living organ donors; prohibit. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding secs. 3406z, 3901a & 4002.
Title
Insurance: insurers; denying or limiting insurance to living organ donors; prohibit. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding secs. 3406z, 3901a & 4002.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 375 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 408 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 408 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-08 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0192'23 With Immediate Effect |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/07/2023 02:30 Pm |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/07/2023 01:22 Pm |
2023-10-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/27/2023 02:22 Pm |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2023-10-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2023-10-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2023-10-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 375 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-10-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-10-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-10-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-06-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-06-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-06-28 | House | Received On 06/28/2023 |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 408 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel |