MI SB0383 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - Assigned Pa 0104'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - Assigned Pa 0104'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; foreclosure; redemption period; terminate redemption rights if property is damaged. Amends sec. 3240 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.3240). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4765'13, HB 4766'13, SB 0380'13
Title
Civil procedure; foreclosure; redemption period; terminate redemption rights if property is damaged. Amends sec. 3240 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.3240). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4765'13, HB 4766'13, SB 0380'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 331 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 331 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 261 (Y: 59 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 245 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 331 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 261 (Y: 59 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 245 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0104'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/3/2013 @ 4:19 Pm |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 7/3/2013 @ 11:52 Am |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/26/2013 @ 11:28 Am |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Roll Call # 331 Yeas 28 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2013-06-20 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2013-06-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-06-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2013-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 261 Yeas 59 Nays 50 |
2013-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-06-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-06-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-06-20 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2013-06-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-06-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-06-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2013-06-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-06-11 | House | Received On 06/11/2013 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 245 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |
Same As/Similar To
HB4767 (Same As) 2013-05-28 - Printed Bill Filed 05/24/2013