MI SB0380 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Education: other; prescreening for dyslexia in public schools; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1280i.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education: other; prescreening for dyslexia in public schools; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1280i.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 225 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-11HouseReferred To Committee On Education
2022-05-11HouseRead A First Time
2022-05-11HouseReceived On 05/11/2022
2022-05-11SenatePassed Roll Call # 225 Yeas 33 Nays 0 Excused 5 Not Voting 0
2022-05-10SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
2022-05-10SenateSubstitute (s-2) Concurred In
2022-05-10SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2022-03-23SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2022-03-23SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2021-04-22SenateReferred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness
2021-04-22SenateIntroduced By Senator Jeff Irwin

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback