MI SB0380 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0539'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of failure to report a dead body with purpose of concealing fact of or cause of death; provide for. Amends sec. 13k, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13k). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0231'11

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of failure to report a dead body with purpose of concealing fact of or cause of death; provide for. Amends sec. 13k, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13k). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0231'11

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 1021 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 743 (Y: 94 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 270 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0539'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 4:32 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 3:49 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31SenatePresented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 1:34 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-13SenateFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-13SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2012-12-13SenateHouse Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 1021 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-12-13SenateHouse Inserted Full Title
2012-12-12HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-12HouseInserted Full Title
2012-12-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 743 Yeas 94 Nays 14
2012-12-12HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-11HouseAmended
2012-12-11HouseRead A Second Time
2012-11-29HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-11-29HouseReported With Recommendation With Amendment(s)
2011-06-07HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2011-06-07HouseRead A First Time
2011-06-07HouseReceived On 06/07/2011
2011-06-07SenatePassed Roll Call # 270 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2011-06-01SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2011-06-01SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2011-06-01SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2011-05-19SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2011-05-19SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2011-05-19SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2011-05-17SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-SB-0380
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2011-SIB-0380.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBS-0380.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBH-0380.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2011-SNB-0380.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0539.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2011-SJ-05-19-044.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2011-SJ-06-07-050.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-11-29-076.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-12-081.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-13-080.htm

Bill Comments

feedback