MI SB0370 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-07 - Assigned Pa 0146'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Occupations; athletics; Michigan unarmed combat regulatory act; revise fines and make other general revisions. Amends secs. 20, 30, 33, 33a, 47, 48 & 54a of 2004 PA 403 (MCL 338.3620 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupations; athletics; Michigan unarmed combat regulatory act; revise fines and make other general revisions. Amends secs. 20, 30, 33, 33a, 47, 48 & 54a of 2004 PA 403 (MCL 338.3620 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 304 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 229 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-07SenateAssigned Pa 0146'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-11-07SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 11/2/2017 @ 1:26 Pm
2017-11-07SenateApproved By Governor 11/2/2017 @ 12:36 Pm
2017-10-31SenatePresented To Governor 10/30/2017 @ 2:37 Pm
2017-10-17SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-10-17SenateFull Title Agreed To
2017-10-17SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2017-10-11HouseReturned To Senate
2017-10-11HouseInserted Full Title
2017-10-11HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 304 Yeas 107 Nays 1
2017-10-11HouseRead A Third Time
2017-10-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-10-10HouseRead A Second Time
2017-09-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-09-27HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-05-30HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2017-05-30HouseRead A First Time
2017-05-30HouseReceived On 05/30/2017
2017-05-30SenatePassed Roll Call # 229 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2017-05-24SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-05-24SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-05-18SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-05-18SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-05-18SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-05-10SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2017-05-10SenateIntroduced By Senator David Robertson

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0370
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0370.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0370.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0370.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0370.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0146.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-05-18-048.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-05-30-052.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-09-27-070.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-11-076.htm

Bill Comments

feedback