MI SB0366 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology
Pending: House Energy, Communications, And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology
Pending: House Energy, Communications, And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Energy: natural gas; penalties for natural gas safety violations; modify. Amends sec. 11 of 1969 PA 165 (MCL 483.161).
Title
Energy: natural gas; penalties for natural gas safety violations; modify. Amends sec. 11 of 1969 PA 165 (MCL 483.161).
Sponsors
Sen. Sean McCann [D] | Sen. Jeff Irwin [D] | Sen. Sue Shink [D] | Sen. Samir Singh [D] |
Sen. Paul Wojno [D] | Sen. Dayna Polehanki [D] | Sen. Rosemary Bayer [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 28 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology |
2024-02-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-02-22 | House | Received On 02/22/2024 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 28 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Sean Mccann |