MI SB0364 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Placed On Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Placed On Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation: railroads; local grade separation fund and grant program; create. Amends 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651 - 247.675) by adding sec. 11i.
Title
Transportation: railroads; local grade separation fund and grant program; create. Amends 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651 - 247.675) by adding sec. 11i.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] | Sen. Stephanie Chang [D] | Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] | Sen. Marshall Bullock [D] |
Sen. Dayna Polehanki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 99 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2020-12-16 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-12-16 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-03-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-03-11 | House | Received On 03/11/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 99 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale W. Zorn |