MI SB0360 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 0165'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health occupations; pharmacists; dispensing additional quantities of a prescription drug within the limits of the prescription; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 17751 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17751).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health occupations; pharmacists; dispensing additional quantities of a prescription drug within the limits of the prescription; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 17751 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17751).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 320 (Y: 88 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 301 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-28SenateAssigned Pa 0165'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-11-28SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 11/13/2017 @ 10:02 Am
2017-11-28SenateApproved By Governor 11/9/2017 @ 11:13 Am
2017-11-08SenatePresented To Governor 11/7/2017 @ 3:10 Pm
2017-10-31SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-10-31SenateFull Title Agreed To
2017-10-31SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2017-10-19HouseReturned To Senate
2017-10-19HouseInserted Full Title
2017-10-19HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 320 Yeas 88 Nays 19
2017-10-19HouseRead A Third Time
2017-10-19HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-10-19HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-10-19HouseRead A Second Time
2017-09-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-09-27HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-07-12HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2017-07-12HouseRead A First Time
2017-07-12HouseReceived On 06/22/2017
2017-06-22SenatePassed Roll Call # 301 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2017-06-21SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2017-06-21SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2017-06-21SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-06-07SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2017-06-07SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-06-07SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-05-03SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2017-05-03SenateIntroduced By Senator Margaret O'brien

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0360
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0360.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0360.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0360.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0360.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0165.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-06-07-055.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-06-22-062.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-09-27-070.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-19-080.htm

Bill Comments

feedback