MI SB0358 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-19 - Assigned Pa 0131'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Liquor; advertising; providing signs that promote brands and prices of alcoholic liquor to retailers; allow. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 610a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liquor; advertising; providing signs that promote brands and prices of alcoholic liquor to retailers; allow. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 610a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 277 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 267 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-19SenateAssigned Pa 0131'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-10-19SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 10/17/2017 @ 2:22 Pm
2017-10-19SenateApproved By Governor 10/17/2017 @ 12:25 Pm
2017-10-17SenatePresented To Governor 10/13/2017 @ 9:48 Am
2017-09-27SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-09-27SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2017-09-27SenateFull Title Agreed To
2017-09-20HouseReturned To Senate
2017-09-20HouseInserted Full Title
2017-09-20HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 277 Yeas 106 Nays 1
2017-09-20HouseRead A Third Time
2017-09-19HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-09-19HouseRead A Second Time
2017-09-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-09-13HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-06-15HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2017-06-15HouseRead A First Time
2017-06-15HouseReceived On 06/15/2017
2017-06-15SenatePassed Roll Call # 267 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2017-06-14SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2017-06-14SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2017-06-14SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-05-25SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2017-05-25SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-05-25SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-05-02SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2017-05-02SenateIntroduced By Senator Rick Jones

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0358
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0358.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0358.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0358.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0358.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0131.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-05-25-051.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-06-15-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-09-13-065.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-09-20-068.htm

Bill Comments

feedback