MI SB0350 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Assigned Pa 0099'24 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Assigned Pa 0099'24 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education: financial aid; qualified educational expenses under the promise zone authority act; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 2008 PA 549 (MCL 390.1663).
Title
Higher education: financial aid; qualified educational expenses under the promise zone authority act; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 2008 PA 549 (MCL 390.1663).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 243 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 598 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 598 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0099'24 With Immediate Effect |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 12:06 Pm |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/23/2024 10:06 Am |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/15/2024 02:32 Pm |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2024-06-26 | House | Returned To Senate |
2024-06-26 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2024-06-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 243 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-26 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-06-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-10-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2023-10-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-31 | House | Received On 10/26/2023 |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 598 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rosemary Bayer |