MI SB0342 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-04 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; evidence; use of facial recognition technology by law enforcement officials; prohibit, and provide remedies. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 21b to ch. XVI.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; evidence; use of facial recognition technology by law enforcement officials; prohibit, and provide remedies. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 21b to ch. XVI.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 322 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-04HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-12-04HouseRead A First Time
2019-12-04HouseReceived On 12/04/2019
2019-12-04SenatePassed Roll Call # 322 Yeas 32 Nays 4 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2019-11-13SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2019-11-13SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-11-13SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-10-08SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2019-10-08SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-10-08SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-05-22SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2019-05-22SenateIntroduced By Senator Peter J. Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback