MI SB0334 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Assigned Pa 0035'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Assigned Pa 0035'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; reporting child abuse or child neglect through an online reporting system and waiving a written report under certain circumstances; allow, change venereal disease to sexually transmitted infection, and allow federal or state governmental agency access to certain records. Amends secs. 2, 3 & 7 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.622 et seq.).
Title
Children; protection; reporting child abuse or child neglect through an online reporting system and waiving a written report under certain circumstances; allow, change venereal disease to sexually transmitted infection, and allow federal or state governmental agency access to certain records. Amends secs. 2, 3 & 7 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.622 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Emmons [R] | Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. Marty Knollenberg [R] | Sen. Mike Nofs [R] |
Sen. Steven Bieda [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 79 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 61 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 437 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 61 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 437 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0035'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/8/2016 @ 2:14 Pm |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/8/2016 @ 10:30 Am |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/3/2016 @ 4:44 Pm |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Roll Call # 79 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2016-02-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-02-24 | House | Title Amended |
2016-02-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 61 Yeas 103 Nays 0 |
2016-02-24 | House | Amended |
2016-02-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-02-23 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2016-02-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-10-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-10-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-10-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2015-10-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-15 | House | Received On 10/15/2015 |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 437 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Judith Emmons |
Subjects
Children: abuse or neglect
Children: protection
Human services: children's services
State agencies (existing): human services
Children: protection
Human services: children's services
State agencies (existing): human services