MI SB0331 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 624'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 624'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Health; occupations; licensing of genetic counselors; require. Amends secs. 17001 & 17021 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17001 & 333.17021).
Title
Health; occupations; licensing of genetic counselors; require. Amends secs. 17001 & 17021 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17001 & 333.17021).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1029 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 946 (Y: 97 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 519 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 946 (Y: 97 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 519 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 624'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 6:00 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:27 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2018 @ 12:58 Pm |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Roll Call # 1029 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 946 Yeas 97 Nays 11 |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-20 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 519 Yeas 33 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Judith Emmons |
Subjects
Health: genetics
Health: occupations
Occupations: advisors and counselors
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Health: occupations
Occupations: advisors and counselors
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): health and human services