MI SB0323 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 0002'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Counties; boards and commissions; powers and duties of county road commissioners to be exercised by the county board of commissioners; remove sunset, and require a vote of the electors before transferring powers and duties of an elected county road commission to an appointed county road commission. Amends sec. 6, ch. IV of 1909 PA 283 (MCL 224.6). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0322'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties; boards and commissions; powers and duties of county road commissioners to be exercised by the county board of commissioners; remove sunset, and require a vote of the electors before transferring powers and duties of an elected county road commission to an appointed county road commission. Amends sec. 6, ch. IV of 1909 PA 283 (MCL 224.6). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0322'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 2 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 375 (Y: 80 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 171 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-28SenateAssigned Pa 0002'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-01-28SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 01/27/2020 02:56 Pm
2020-01-28SenateApproved By Governor 01/24/2020 10:33 Am
2020-01-15SenatePresented To Governor 01/14/2020 10:24 Am
2020-01-08SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-01-08SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-01-08SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 2 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-01-08SenateHouse Substitute (h-5) Concurred In
2019-12-19SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-12-11HouseReturned To Senate
2019-12-11HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 375 Yeas 80 Nays 28 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-12-11HouseRead A Third Time
2019-12-11HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-12-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-12-11HouseSubstitute (h-5) Adopted
2019-12-11HouseRead A Second Time
2019-12-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-12-10HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-5)
2019-09-18HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-08-28HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
2019-08-28HouseRead A First Time
2019-08-28HouseReceived On 08/28/2019
2019-08-28SenatePassed Roll Call # 171 Yeas 28 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-06-20SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2019-06-20SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-06-20SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-06-11SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2019-06-11SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-06-11SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-05-16SenateReferred To Committee On Local Government
2019-05-16SenateIntroduced By Senator Roger Victory

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0323
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0323.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0323.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0323.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0323.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-11-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-08-28-079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-12-10-113.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-12-11-114.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-01-08-001.htm

Bill Comments

feedback