MI SB0304 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Elections: election officials; notice to a voter who votes a provisional ballot concerning the burden of proof to verify his or her identity to have the provisional ballot tabulated and his or her ability to obtain an official state personal identification card without a fee; require. Amends sec. 523a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.523a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0303'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: election officials; notice to a voter who votes a provisional ballot concerning the burden of proof to verify his or her identity to have the provisional ballot tabulated and his or her ability to obtain an official state personal identification card without a fee; require. Amends sec. 523a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.523a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0303'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 471 (Y: 56 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 372 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 369 (Y: 58 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 276 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-02SenatePostponed For The Day
2021-11-02SenateVetoed By Governor 10/29/2021
2021-10-21SenatePresented To Governor 10/20/2021 12:04 Pm
2021-10-19SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-10-19SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2021-10-19SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2021-10-14HouseRe-returned To Senate
2021-10-14HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2021-10-14HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 471 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2021-10-14HouseSenate Substitute (s-3) To House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
2021-10-07HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-10-07HouseRe-returned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) To House Substitute (h-1) With Title Amendment
2021-10-07HouseReturned To Senate
2021-10-07SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 372 Yeas 20 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-10-07SenateHouse Substitute (h-1) Concurred In As Substituted (s-3)
2021-10-07SenateSubstitute (s-3) Adopted
2021-06-24SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-06-23HouseReturned To Senate
2021-06-23HouseTitle Amended
2021-06-23HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 369 Yeas 58 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-06-23HouseRead A Third Time
2021-06-23HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-06-23HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-06-23HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-06-23HouseRead A Second Time
2021-06-23HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-06-23HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-06-16HouseReferred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
2021-06-16HouseRead A First Time
2021-06-16HouseReceived On 06/16/2021
2021-06-16SenatePassed Roll Call # 276 Yeas 19 Nays 16 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-06-16SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-06-16SenateRules Suspended
2021-06-16SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2021-06-16SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2021-06-03SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-06-03SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-06-03SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-03-24SenateReferred To Committee On Elections
2021-03-24SenateIntroduced By Senator Curtis S. Vanderwall

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0304
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0304.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBH-0304.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2021-SNB-0304.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0304-0N2916.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0304-0I1046.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0285-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0285-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0303-DFF93C78.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0303-3F1C4843.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0303-6B50EEB6.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-06-03-051.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-06-16-056.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-23-060.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-07-078.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-10-14-084.htm

Bill Comments

feedback