MI SB0269 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Assigned Pa 0077'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Assigned Pa 0077'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax: returns; taxpayer protection act; provide for. Amends 1941 PA 122 (MCL 205.1 - 205.31) by adding sec. 4a.
Title
Individual income tax: returns; taxpayer protection act; provide for. Amends 1941 PA 122 (MCL 205.1 - 205.31) by adding sec. 4a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 110 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 159 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 216 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 159 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 216 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0077'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 04/02/2020 10:04 Am |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Approved By Governor 04/02/2020 08:52 Am |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 03/19/2020 12:54 Pm |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 110 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | House Substitute (h-4) Concurred In |
2020-03-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 159 Yeas 104 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-03-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Substitute (h-4) Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-4) |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-4) |
2019-09-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2019-09-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-19 | House | Received On 09/19/2019 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 216 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Erika Geiss |