MI SB0264 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0585'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Use tax; collections; prepayment collection process; revise. Amends sec. 6 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.96).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use tax; collections; prepayment collection process; revise. Amends sec. 6 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.96).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 708 (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 677 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0585'12
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 1/3/2013 @ 4:02 Pm
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 12/27/2012 @ 9:19 Am
2012-12-27SenatePresented To Governor 12/21/2012 @ 9:56 Am
2012-12-11SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-11SenateFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-11SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2012-12-11SenateHouse Inserted Full Title
2012-12-06HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-06HouseInserted Full Title
2012-12-06HousePassed Roll Call # 708 Yeas 66 Nays 43
2012-12-06HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-04HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-04HouseRead A Second Time
2012-11-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-11-27HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2012-09-27HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2012-09-27HouseRead A First Time
2012-09-27HouseReceived On 09/27/2012
2012-09-27SenatePassed Roll Call # 677 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-09-25SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2012-09-25SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2012-09-25SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2012-09-20SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2012-09-20SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-09-20SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2011-03-15SenateReferred To Committee On Finance

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-SB-0264
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2011-SIB-0264.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBS-0264.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBH-0264.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2011-SNB-0264.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0585.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-09-20-067.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-09-27-069.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-11-27-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-06-079.htm

Bill Comments

feedback