MI SB0252 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Assigned Pa 0010'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Assigned Pa 0010'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Watercraft; marinas; marina dredging loan origination program; establish. Creates new act.
Title
Watercraft; marinas; marina dredging loan origination program; establish. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 64 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 52 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 52 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0010'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/27/2013 @ 1:50 Pm |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/27/2013 @ 12:18 Pm |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/26/2013 @ 2:37 Pm |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-03-21 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 64 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 Yeas 106 Nays 4 |
2013-03-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Amended |
2013-03-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2013-03-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-03-14 | House | Received On 03/14/2013 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 52 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jack Brandenburg |
Same As/Similar To
HB4410 (Same As) 2013-03-13 - Printed Bill Filed 03/13/2013