MI SB0248 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0182'24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Courts: other; age requirement for the use of a courtroom support dog; modify. Amends sec. 2163a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2163a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts: other; age requirement for the use of a courtroom support dog; modify. Amends sec. 2163a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2163a).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 354 (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 341 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0182'24
2024-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/30/2024 11:40 Am
2024-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 12/30/2024 10:08 Am
2024-12-20SenatePresented To Governor 12/19/2024 09:36 Am
2024-12-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2023-06-14SenateFull Title Agreed To
2024-12-12SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 571 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2024-12-12SenateHouse Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
2024-12-12SenateRules Suspended For Immediate Consideration
2024-12-12SenatePassed By House With Substitute (h-1) With Immediate Effect
2024-11-14HouseReturned To Senate
2024-11-14HouseInserted Full Title
2024-11-14HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 354 Yeas 99 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 8
2024-11-14HouseRead A Third Time
2024-06-18HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-06-18HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2024-06-18HouseRead A Second Time
2023-10-11HouseReferred To Second Reading
2023-10-11HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2023-06-14HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2023-06-14HouseRead A First Time
2023-06-14HouseReceived On 06/14/2023
2023-06-14SenatePassed Roll Call # 341 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2023-06-13SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2023-06-13SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2023-06-13SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2023-06-13SenateRules Suspended For Immediate Consideration
2023-06-13SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2023-06-13SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2023-04-11SenateReferred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
2023-04-11SenateIntroduced By Senator Dan Lauwers

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-SB-0248
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2023-SIB-0248.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBS-0248.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBH-0248.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2023-SNB-0248.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/publicact/htm/2024-PA-0182.htm
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-SCVBS-0248-00B74.pdf
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-SCVBS-0248-00D48.pdf
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-SCVBS-0248-0N2915.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0248-G.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0248-S.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0248-F.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0248-915A2DFE.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0248-3F31C93B.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0248-U.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0248-8DB1A9CA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-06-13-056.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-06-14-057.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-10-11-083.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-11-14-078.htm

Bill Comments

feedback