MI SB0238 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 0171'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 0171'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer credit; lending practices; authority to pay referral fees under regulatory loan act; clarify. Amends sec. 12 of 1939 PA 21 (MCL 493.12).
Title
Consumer credit; lending practices; authority to pay referral fees under regulatory loan act; clarify. Amends sec. 12 of 1939 PA 21 (MCL 493.12).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 379 (Y: 72 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 182 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 182 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0171'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/21/2017 @ 3:36 Pm |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/20/2017 @ 11:16 Am |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/16/2017 @ 3:42 Pm |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-11-07 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-11-07 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-11-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 379 Yeas 72 Nays 35 |
2017-11-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2017-05-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-16 | House | Received On 05/16/2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 182 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |
Subjects
Consumer credit: lending practices
Financial institutions: other
Occupations: business licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services
Financial institutions: other
Occupations: business licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services