MI SB0225 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-01 - Assigned Pa 0200'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-01 - Assigned Pa 0200'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; firearms; pistol transfer process for an heir or devisee; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.422).
Title
Weapons; firearms; pistol transfer process for an heir or devisee; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.422).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 401 (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 386 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 386 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-01 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0200'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/24/2015 @ 2:00 Pm |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/24/2015 @ 8:46 Am |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/19/2015 @ 10:57 Am |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2015-10-29 | House | Returned To Senate |
2015-10-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 401 Yeas 99 Nays 6 |
2015-10-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-10-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-10-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-10-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-10-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-09-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-09-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-09-30 | House | Received On 09/30/2015 |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 386 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 As Amended |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Substitute S-3 As Amended Concurred In |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 And Amendment(s) |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mike Shirkey |