MI SB0213 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned Pa 0022'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned Pa 0022'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health; other; prescribing drugs, including controlled substances, via telehealth; provide for under certain circumstances and allow Michigan board of nursing to promulgate certain rules for clinical nurse specialists. Amends secs. 16285, 16287, 17210 & 17211 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16285 et seq.).
Title
Health; other; prescribing drugs, including controlled substances, via telehealth; provide for under certain circumstances and allow Michigan board of nursing to promulgate certain rules for clinical nurse specialists. Amends secs. 16285, 16287, 17210 & 17211 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16285 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 80 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 54 (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 64 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 54 (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 64 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0022'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/31/2017 @ 10:40 Am |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/30/2017 @ 10:08 Am |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/27/2017 @ 12:39 Pm |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Roll Call # 80 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Title Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 54 Yeas 104 Nays 4 |
2017-03-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-03-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-03-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-03-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-09 | House | Received On 03/09/2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 64 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Macgregor |
Subjects
Health occupations: health professionals
Health occupations: nurses
Health: controlled substances
Health: other
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Health occupations: nurses
Health: controlled substances
Health: other
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs