MI SB0160 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-06 - Assigned Pa 0094'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-06 - Assigned Pa 0094'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; motorcycles; definitions of implement of husbandry, autocycle, and motorcycle; modify. Amends secs. 21, 25a & 31 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.21 et seq.).
Title
Vehicles; motorcycles; definitions of implement of husbandry, autocycle, and motorcycle; modify. Amends secs. 21, 25a & 31 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.21 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 282 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 104 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 104 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-06 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0094'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/13/2017 @ 3:18 Pm |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Approved By Governor 7/13/2017 @ 12:17 Pm |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Presented To Governor 7/11/2017 @ 2:32 Pm |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Roll Call # 282 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2017-06-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-06-20 | House | Title Amended |
2017-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 Yeas 68 Nays 39 |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-06-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-06-15 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-06-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-06-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2017-04-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-19 | House | Received On 04/18/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 104 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |