MI SB0157 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Assigned Pa 0025'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Assigned Pa 0025'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: health professionals; reciprocity for veterans, members of the armed forces, members of the uniformed services, and their dependents who hold an out-of-state license or registration; provide for. Amends secs. 16103, 16109, 16181, 16303, 16323 & 20950 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16103 et seq.) & adds sec. 16186a.
Title
Health occupations: health professionals; reciprocity for veterans, members of the armed forces, members of the uniformed services, and their dependents who hold an out-of-state license or registration; provide for. Amends secs. 16103, 16109, 16181, 16303, 16323 & 20950 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16103 et seq.) & adds sec. 16186a.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bizon [R] | Sen. Adam Hollier [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 265 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 93 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 93 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0025'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/09/2021 02:36 Pm |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Approved By Governor 06/09/2021 01:19 Pm |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Presented To Governor 06/07/2021 11:30 Am |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-05-27 | House | Returned To Senate |
2021-05-27 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 265 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-05-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-04-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-21 | House | Received On 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 93 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Bizon, M.d. |
Subjects
Health occupations: health professionals
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Veterans: employment
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Veterans: employment