MI SB0154 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Cities; home rule; reference to local government and school district fiscal accountability act; provide for in the home rule city act. Amends sec. 36a of 1909 PA 279 (MCL 117.36a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0153'11
Title
Cities; home rule; reference to local government and school district fiscal accountability act; provide for in the home rule city act. Amends sec. 36a of 1909 PA 279 (MCL 117.36a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0153'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
Same As/Similar To
HB4218 (Same As) 2011-03-17 - Assigned Pa 7'11 With Immediate Effect