MI SB0139 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Assigned Pa 0042'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Assigned Pa 0042'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; other; certain fund-raising activities during school hours; allow. Amends sec. 1272b of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1272b).
Title
Education; other; certain fund-raising activities during school hours; allow. Amends sec. 1272b of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1272b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 192 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 60 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 60 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0042'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/3/2015 @ 4:40 Pm |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/3/2015 @ 9:38 Am |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/26/2015 @ 12:51 Pm |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Roll Call # 192 Yeas 33 Nays 3 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2015-05-19 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2015-05-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2015-05-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2015-05-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 Yeas 66 Nays 43 |
2015-05-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-05-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-05-12 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2015-05-12 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2015-05-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2015-03-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-19 | House | Received On 03/19/2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 60 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Patrick Colbeck |
Same As/Similar To
HB4202 (Same As) 2015-02-18 - Printed Bill Filed 02/18/2015