MI SB0134 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; community colleges; provide for fiscal year 2017-2018. Amends secs. 201 & 201a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1801 & 388.1801a).
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; community colleges; provide for fiscal year 2017-2018. Amends secs. 201 & 201a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1801 & 388.1801a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 161 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-05-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-04 | House | Received On 05/04/2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 161 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |