MI SB0129 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Assigned Pa 0032'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Aeronautics; unmanned aircraft systems; local ordinances; allow a political subdivision to regulate unmanned aircraft systems in certain circumstances. Amends sec. 5 of 2016 PA 436 (MCL 259.305).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aeronautics; unmanned aircraft systems; local ordinances; allow a political subdivision to regulate unmanned aircraft systems in certain circumstances. Amends sec. 5 of 2016 PA 436 (MCL 259.305).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 137 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 122 (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 27 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateAssigned Pa 0032'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-06-26SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 6/25/2019 @ 10:32 Am
2019-06-26SenateApproved By Governor 6/25/2019 @ 9:08 Am
2019-06-25SenatePresented To Governor 6/20/2019 @ 3:46 Pm
2019-06-18SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-18SenateFull Title Agreed To
2019-06-18SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2019-06-18Senate Roll Call # 137 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2019-06-18SenateHouse Substitute H-5 Concurred In
2019-06-13SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-06-12HouseReturned To Senate
2019-06-12HouseInserted Full Title
2019-06-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 122 Yeas 95 Nays 12
2019-06-12HouseRead A Third Time
2019-06-12HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-06-12HouseSubstitute H-5 Adopted
2019-06-12HouseRead A Second Time
2019-06-12HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-06-12HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5
2019-06-04HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute H-3
2019-04-24HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation
2019-04-24HouseRead A First Time
2019-04-24HouseReceived On 04/24/2019
2019-04-24SenatePassed Roll Call # 27 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-04-23SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2019-04-23SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-04-23SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-03-21SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2019-03-21SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-03-21SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2019-02-26SenateIntroduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0129
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0129.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0129.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0129.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0129.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0032.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-03-21-030.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-04-24-038.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-06-12-060.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-18-062.htm

Bill Comments

feedback