MI SB0127 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Health occupations: health professionals; prescribers to obtain a Michigan Automated Prescription System (MAPS) report before prescribing or dispensing a controlled substance; provide exemption for hospice, and exempt hospice patients from bona fide prescriber-patient relationship requirement for prescribing a controlled substance. Amends sec. 7303a of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7303a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health occupations: health professionals; prescribers to obtain a Michigan Automated Prescription System (MAPS) report before prescribing or dispensing a controlled substance; provide exemption for hospice, and exempt hospice patients from bona fide prescriber-patient relationship requirement for prescribing a controlled substance. Amends sec. 7303a of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7303a).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 20 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2019-04-18HouseRead A First Time
2019-04-18HouseReceived On 04/18/2019
2019-04-18SenatePassed Roll Call # 20 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2019-04-10SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2019-04-10SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-04-10SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-03-14SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-03-14SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2019-02-26SenateIntroduced By Senator Curtis Vanderwall

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback