MI SB0110 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0170'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0170'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Probate; guardians and conservators; limited guardianship to supervise access of a person to an incapacitated individual; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 5306 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.5306).
Title
Probate; guardians and conservators; limited guardianship to supervise access of a person to an incapacitated individual; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 5306 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.5306).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 346 (Y: 100 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 241 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 241 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0170'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 01:08 Pm |
2019-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/20/2019 12:10 Pm |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/13/2019 01:11 Pm |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2019-12-10 | House | Returned To Senate |
2019-12-10 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2019-12-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 346 Yeas 100 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-12-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-11-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-11-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-10-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-10-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-02 | House | Received On 10/02/2019 |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 241 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Lucido |