MI SB0099 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0233'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0233'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Family law; friend of the court; friend of the court act; make miscellaneous revisions. Amends secs. 2, 2a, 5, 5a, 9a, 11a, 13, 15, 17, 17b, 19, 27 & 28 of 1982 PA 294 (MCL 552.502 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5501'09, HB 5502'09, SB 0101'09, SB 0104'09
Title
Family law; friend of the court; friend of the court act; make miscellaneous revisions. Amends secs. 2, 2a, 5, 5a, 9a, 11a, 13, 15, 17, 17b, 19, 27 & 28 of 1982 PA 294 (MCL 552.502 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5501'09, HB 5502'09, SB 0101'09, SB 0104'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-11-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-31 | Assigned Pa 0233'09 With Immediate Effect | |
2009-12-31 | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/8/2010 @ 3:23 Pm | |
2009-12-31 | Approved By Governor 1/8/2010 @ 2:53 Pm 2009 Addenda | |
2009-12-30 | Presented To Governor 12/28/2009 @ 2:46 Pm | |
2009-12-17 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-12-17 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2009-12-17 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2009-12-17 | Roll Call # 711 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-12-17 | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In | |
2009-12-17 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2009-12-16 | Returned To Senate | |
2009-12-16 | Inserted Full Title | |
2009-12-16 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 630 Yeas 100 Nays 5 | |
2009-12-16 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-12-16 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-12-16 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-12-16 | Substitute H-3 Adopted | |
2009-12-16 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-11-04 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-11-04 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 | |
2009-02-10 | Referred To Committee On Families And Children's Services | |
2009-02-10 | Read A First Time | |
2009-02-10 | Received On 02/10/2009 | |
2009-02-10 | Passed Roll Call # 10 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-02-05 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-02-03 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-02-03 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-02-03 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-01-28 | Referred To Committee On Families And Human Services |