MI SB0097 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State financing and management; authorities; public-private partnerships; allow for certain public authorities. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State financing and management; authorities; public-private partnerships; allow for certain public authorities. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 40 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-28HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-11-28HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-02-28HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2017-02-28HouseRead A First Time
2017-02-28HouseReceived On 02/23/2017
2017-02-23SenatePassed Roll Call # 40 Yeas 32 Nays 4 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2017-02-22SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-02-22SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-02-16SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-02-16SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-02-16SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-02-02SenateReferred To Committee On Commerce
2017-02-02SenateIntroduced By Senator Michael Kowall

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback