MI SB0095 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-21 - Assigned Pa 0122'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-21 - Assigned Pa 0122'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2008-2009. Creates appropriation bill.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2008-2009. Creates appropriation bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-21 | Assigned Pa 0122'09 With Immediate Effect | |
2009-10-21 | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/19/2009 @ 5:24 Pm | |
2009-10-21 | Approved By Governor 10/19/2009 @ 4:55 Pm | |
2009-10-20 | Presented To Governor 10/16/2009 @ 1:15 Pm | |
2009-10-14 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-10-14 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2009-10-14 | Roll Call # 529 Yeas 32 Nays 2 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-10-14 | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In | |
2009-09-17 | Returned To Senate | |
2009-09-17 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 446 Yeas 107 Nays 0 | |
2009-09-17 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-09-17 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-09-17 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-09-17 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2009-09-17 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-09-15 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-09-15 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-09-02 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2009-09-02 | Read A First Time | |
2009-09-02 | Received On 08/27/2009 | |
2009-08-27 | Passed Roll Call # 414 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-08-27 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-08-27 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-08-27 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-08-27 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-08-27 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-08-27 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-08-27 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-08-27 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-01-28 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |