MI SB0076 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-06 - Assigned Pa 0093'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-06 - Assigned Pa 0093'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; supplemental; Michigan natural resources trust fund; provide appropriations for fiscal year 2016-2017. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; supplemental; Michigan natural resources trust fund; provide appropriations for fiscal year 2016-2017. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 311 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 208 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 224 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 208 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 224 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-06 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0093'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/13/2017 @ 3:16 Pm |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Approved By Governor 7/13/2017 @ 12:41 Pm |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Presented To Governor 7/11/2017 @ 2:56 Pm |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Roll Call # 311 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In |
2017-06-15 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-06-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 208 Yeas 104 Nays 3 |
2017-06-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-06-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2017-06-14 | House | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted |
2017-06-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-05-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-24 | House | Received On 05/24/2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 224 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |