MI SB0073 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0304'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0304'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: driver license; address confidentiality program for certain victims and individuals; allow for driver license to be issued with designated address. Amends secs. 40b, 307, 310 & 314 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.40b et seq.) & adds sec. 310f. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0070'19
Title
Traffic control: driver license; address confidentiality program for certain victims and individuals; allow for driver license to be issued with designated address. Amends secs. 40b, 307, 310 & 314 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.40b et seq.) & adds sec. 310f. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0070'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 471 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 499 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 272 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 499 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 272 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0304'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 02:20 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2020 10:32 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2020 04:17 Pm |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-12-17 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-12-17 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 587 Yeas 105 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-12-17 | House | Senate Substitute (s-3) To House Substitute (h-3) Concurred In |
2020-12-16 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-12-16 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) To House Substitute (h-3) With Title Amendment |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 555 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-16 | Senate | House Substitute (h-3) Concurred In As Substituted (s-3) |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Adopted |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2020-12-16 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-16 | House | Request Granted |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Senate Requests Return |
2020-12-10 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-12-10 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) To House Substitute (h-3) |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 471 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-09 | Senate | House Substitute (h-3) Concurred In As Substituted (s-1) |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-12-01 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-01 | House | Title Amended |
2020-12-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 499 Yeas 103 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2020-12-01 | House | Amended |
2020-12-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-07-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-07-22 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2020-07-22 | House | Substitute (h-1) Not Adopted |
2020-07-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-07-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-10-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-10-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-22 | House | Received On 10/22/2019 |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 272 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Stephanie Chang |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |