MI SB0069 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned Pa 0021'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned Pa 0021'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; other; disclosure of certain information in procurement process; modify. Amends sec. 261 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1261).
Title
State financing and management; other; disclosure of certain information in procurement process; modify. Amends sec. 261 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1261).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 76 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 50 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 10 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 9 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 33 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 50 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 10 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 9 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 33 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0021'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/31/2017 @ 10:38 Am |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/30/2017 @ 10:06 Am |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/27/2017 @ 12:37 Pm |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Roll Call # 76 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-returned To Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Title Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | Passed Roll Call # 50 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2017-03-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-03-21 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2017-03-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned As Requested |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Return Granted |
2017-03-21 | Senate | House Requests Return |
2017-03-16 | House | House Requests Return |
2017-03-08 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed Roll Call # 10 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-03-08 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2017-03-02 | House | Postponed For The Day |
2017-03-02 | House | Motion To Reconsider Passage |
2017-03-02 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 9 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2017-03-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-02-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-15 | House | Received On 02/15/2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 33 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |