MI SB0056 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0537'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0537'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; renaming a portion of M-21; designate as "Mark V. Ingram II Freeway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 1059.
Title
Highways; name; renaming a portion of M-21; designate as "Mark V. Ingram II Freeway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 1059.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 910 (Y: 83 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 91 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 91 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0537'12 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 4:28 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 3:45 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 3:26 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-14 | House | Passed Roll Call # 910 Yeas 83 Nays 22 |
2012-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-14 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2012-12-14 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2012-12-14 | House | Rule Suspended |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2011-04-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-04-13 | House | Received On 04/13/2011 |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 91 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |